Global patent index - EP 0811049 B1

EP 0811049 B1 2001-04-18 - CLEANING COMPOSITION COMPRISING SATURATED DIALKYL CATIONIC SURFACTANTS

Title (en)

CLEANING COMPOSITION COMPRISING SATURATED DIALKYL CATIONIC SURFACTANTS

Title (de)

GESÄTTIGTE DIALKYL-KATIONTENSIDE ENTHALTENDE REINIGUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE COMPRENANT DES TENSIOACTIFS CATIONIQUES DE DIALKYLE SATURE

Publication

EP 0811049 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96904036 A

Priority

  • EP 9600542 W
  • GB 9503594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9626257A1] The specification discloses improved compositions which both clean a surface and are believed to deposit thereupon a layer of cationic surfactant which assists the release of soil subsequently deposited upon the said surface. These comprise a surfactant mixture, wherein said surfactant mixture itself comprises: a) at least 65 % wt on total surfactant of nonionic surfactant; b) less than 1 % wt on total surfactant of anionic surfactant; and c) 0.1-35 % wt on total surfactant of a cationic surfactant which is a substantially ethylenically saturated dialkyl quaternary ammonium compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/835

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 1/86 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/66 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9626257 A1 19960829; AR 001004 A1 19970827; AU 4789396 A 19960911; AU 719466 B2 20000511; BR 9607341 A 19971125; CA 2211346 A1 19960829; CA 2211346 C 20021008; CN 1175974 A 19980311; DE 69612549 D1 20010523; DE 69612549 T2 20010823; EP 0811049 A1 19971210; EP 0811049 B1 20010418; ES 2158286 T3 20010901; GB 9503594 D0 19950412; HU 226238 B1 20080728; HU 9801722 A2 19990128; HU 9801722 A3 19990301; IN 187275 B 20020316; IN 187431 B 20020427; JP 3207432 B2 20010910; JP H11500478 A 19990112; TR 9700840 T1 19980221; ZA 9601118 B 19970812

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110208

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69612549

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110309

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2158286

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612549

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990401

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970708

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT