Global Patent Index - EP 0811081 B1

EP 0811081 B1 2001-05-23 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A STEEL SHEET OR STRIP FOR MAKING A CAN, AND RESULTING STEEL SHEET OR STRIP

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A STEEL SHEET OR STRIP FOR MAKING A CAN, AND RESULTING STEEL SHEET OR STRIP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON STAHLBLECHERN ODER BANDERN FUR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON DOSEN UND ALSO HERGESTELLTES STAHLBAND ODER STAHLBLECH

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ELABORATION D'UNE TOLE OU D'UNE BANDE EN ACIER POUR LA REALISATION D'UNE BOITE ET TOLE OU BANDE EN ACIER OBTENUE PAR CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0811081 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96904131 A

Priority

  • FR 9600233 W
  • FR 9502208 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9626295A1] A method for producing a sheet or strip suitable for making a can by swaging and stretching, using a steel comprising less than 0.008 wt.% of carbon, 0.10-0.30 wt.% of manganese, less than 0.006 wt.% of nitrogen, 0.01-0.06 wt.% of aluminium, less than 0.015 wt.% of phosphorus, less than 0.020 wt.% of sulphur, less than 0.020.wt % of silicon, and no more than 0.08 wt.% of one or more elements selected from copper, nickel and chromium, the balance being iron and residual impurities. According to the method, a slab is hot-rolled into a hot-rolled sheet or strip less than 3 mm thick, then the hot-rolled sheet or strip is cold-rolled with a draught of 83-92 %, subjected to recrystallisation annealing and finally cold-rolled again with a draught of 10-40 %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/04; C22C 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/48 (2006.01); C21D 8/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2013.01); C21D 8/0436 (2013.01); C21D 8/0468 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9626295 A1 19960829; AT 201455 T 20010615; AU 4834296 A 19960911; AU 708839 B2 19990812; BR 9607322 A 19971230; CN 1062314 C 20010221; CN 1175978 A 19980311; CZ 291913 B6 20030618; CZ 9702640 A3 19980415; DE 69612964 D1 20010628; DE 69612964 T2 20011213; DK 0811081 T3 20010917; DZ 1996 A1 20020720; EP 0811081 A1 19971210; EP 0811081 B1 20010523; ES 2156615 T3 20010701; FR 2730942 A1 19960830; FR 2730942 B1 19970516; GR 3036311 T3 20011031; HU 220554 B1 20020328; HU 9801208 A2 19980828; HU 9801208 A3 19990928; IL 117174 A 19990620; IL 117174 D0 19960618; JP H11503490 A 19990326; MA 23807 A1 19961001; MX 9706304 A 19971129; PL 180290 B1 20010131; PL 321900 A1 19980105; PT 811081 E 20011031; RO 119236 B1 20040630; TN SN96032 A1 19981231; TW 340875 B 19980921; US 6056832 A 20000502; ZA 9601459 B 19970825

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160214

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160223

2016-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160526

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160212

2016-03-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160212

2016-02-23 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20160213

2016-02-17 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160212

2016-02-15 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160213

2016-02-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69612964

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150206

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150203

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130213

2013-12-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130904

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130214

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-17 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20010401162

- Effective date: 20130904

2013-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201455 T

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010803

2001-09-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2001-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156615 T3

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612964 20010628

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201455 T 20010615

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980917

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970731

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE LI LU NL PT SE