Global Patent Index - EP 0811240 B1

EP 0811240 B1 2000-08-16 - ELECTRODELESS LOW-PRESSURE DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

ELECTRODELESS LOW-PRESSURE DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

ELEKTRODENLOSE NIEDERDRUCKENTLADUNGSLAMPE

Title (fr)

LAMPE A DECHARGE BASSE PRESSION SANS ELECTRODE

Publication

EP 0811240 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96938421 A

Priority

  • EP 96938421 A
  • EP 95203588 A
  • IB 9601337 W
  • US 76759896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9723895A2] An electrodeless low-pressure discharge lamp according to the invention is provided with a discharge vessel (10) which is closed in a gastight manner, which has a cavity (11), which encloses a discharge space, and which is provided with an ionizable filling. A coil (20) with a winding (21) of an electric conductor and an assembly (30) of a heat conductor (31) and one or several elongate cores (32) of soft-magnetic material are accommodated in the cavity. The cores (32) are arranged along a longitudinal axis (33) of the heat conductor (31) in one or several recesses (34) of the heat conductor which issue into a circumferential surface (36) of the assembly (30). The heat conductor (31) occupies at least halft the circumference in a cross section perpendicular to the longitudinal axis (33) of the assembly (30). The construction of the lamp according to the invention renders possible lamp operation at higher lamp powers also without the use of a heat pipe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 65/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 65/04 (2006.01); H01J 61/35 (2006.01); H01J 61/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/52 (2013.01); H01J 61/35 (2013.01); H01J 65/048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9723895 A2 19970703; WO 9723895 A3 19970821; CN 1097296 C 20021225; CN 1176019 A 19980311; DE 69609819 D1 20000921; DE 69609819 T2 20010315; EP 0811240 A2 19971210; EP 0811240 B1 20000816; ID 19564 A 19980723; JP 4183748 B2 20081119; JP H11501152 A 19990126; US 5801493 A 19980901

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69609819

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-02-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: QL COMPANY B.V., NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69609819

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111212

2012-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69609819

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DF-MP, DE

- Effective date: 20111212

2012-01-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: QL COMPANY, NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20111219

2011-12-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111124 AND 20111129

2011-12-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69609819

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DF-MP, DE

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-11-22 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: D6

2002-10-09 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609819

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990712

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980105

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB