Global Patent Index - EP 0811485 B1

EP 0811485 B1 2000-09-06 - Apparatus for printing especially textiles, ceramics, paper or plastics

Title (en)

Apparatus for printing especially textiles, ceramics, paper or plastics

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bedrucken insbesondere von textilen Werkstoffen, Keramik, Papier oder Kunststoff

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression sur tissus, sur céramique, sur papier ou sur matières plastiques

Publication

EP 0811485 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97108663 A

Priority

DE 19622230 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811485A2] The printing machine's rotation drive (17) is formed as an indexing table with a rotary plate (19), and the working cycle is electrically indexed. The rotation drive has a three-phase braking motor. The number of pallets (23) determines the indexing. The rotation drive for one working cycle of the pallets in a following processing station has a cycle time of less than one second.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/0863 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19622230 A1 19971204; AT 196113 T 20000915; EP 0811485 A2 19971210; EP 0811485 A3 19980318; EP 0811485 B1 20000906; ES 2152054 T3 20010116; US 5784956 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2006-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050530

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030531

2004-01-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-06-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020614

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020423

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-04-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020408

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152054 T3

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-10-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: KARAGHIOSOFF GIORGIO

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702304 20001012

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196113 T 20000915

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEINZ WALZ TEXTILMASCHINEN HANDELSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990122

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980805

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT