Global Patent Index - EP 0811552 B1

EP 0811552 B1 2000-05-17 - Ship's rudder

Title (en)

Ship's rudder

Title (de)

Ruder für Seeschiffe

Title (fr)

Gouvernail pour navires

Publication

EP 0811552 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96115518 A

Priority

DE 29609745 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811552A1] The rudder has a main rudder body (20) with a tab (10) which is hinged to it, and which is guided by it. The tab is mounted on a sliding piston hinge (11,13), which has a sliding bearing which is mounted on the tab, and also has a pivoting piston (11). The hinge pin is in the form of a piston (15) which can slide in a bearing (16,17), and both pistons may be connected to one another by a pin (14). They may also be made from a high-grade steel and may slide in a bearing which has a lining made from a bronze alloy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 25/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 25/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 25/381 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29609745 U1 19960829; CN 1077533 C 20020109; CN 1169934 A 19980114; EP 0811552 A1 19971210; EP 0811552 B1 20000517; ES 2147882 T3 20001001; JP 3193887 B2 20010730; JP H1053196 A 19980224; KR 100244674 B1 20000302; NO 309806 B1 20010402; NO 964952 A 19971205; NO 964952 D0 19961121

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160928

2017-01-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170103

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160926

2016-10-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160926

2016-09-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160926

2016-09-27 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605253

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-08-25 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BECKER MARINE SYSTEMS GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-05-04 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110408

2002-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-07-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WILLI BECKER INGENIEURBUERO GMBH & CO. KG

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147882 T3

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605253 20000621

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

1999-12-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ST. TECN. INGG. SIMONI - DE BLASIO

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990913

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970619

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL