Global Patent Index - EP 0811555 B1

EP 0811555 B1 2002-09-25 - Conveying device, in particular wheel for forming packaging envelops for cigarettes, or similar

Title (en)

Conveying device, in particular wheel for forming packaging envelops for cigarettes, or similar

Title (de)

Fördervorrichtung, insbesondere ein Rad zum Herstellen einer Verpackungshülle für Zigaretten oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport, spécialement une roue pour la formation d'une enveloppe d'emballage pour cigarettes ou similaires

Publication

EP 0811555 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97108587 A

Priority

IT SV960019 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811555A1] A conveying device, in particular of a wheel forming packaging envelops for cigarettes, or similar comprising at least one peripheral cavity (a) open on the radially external side, preferably a plurality of said cavities (A) for housing a group of cigarettes (G) and for conveying the same from a feeding station (SA) to at least one further discharge station (SC) along a circular or substantially circular track, said cavities (A) being at least partially open also on their radially internal side, for passage through the same of follower means (6) and pusher means (7) displaceable in a radial direction relative to the circular track and provided in the feeding station (SA) and discharge station (SC) respectively. According to the invention the pusher means and the follower means (6, 7) are activated by means of a kinematic motion like an articulated polygon. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0811555 A1 19971210; EP 0811555 B1 20020925; DE 69715729 D1 20021031; DE 69715729 T2 20030605; IT 1288136 B1 19980910; IT SV960019 A1 19971209; IT SV960019 D0 19960607

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050528

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050528

2004-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040601

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715729 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASIB S.P.A.

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001114

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980527

1998-06-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASIB TOBACCO S.P.A.

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB