Global Patent Index - EP 0811560 B1

EP 0811560 B1 2000-10-25 - Tamper-evident closure for neck-like container apertures

Title (en)

Tamper-evident closure for neck-like container apertures

Title (de)

Originalitätsverschluss für stutzenartige Öffnungen von Behältnissen

Title (fr)

Fermeture de garantie pour ouvertures de récipients en forme de col

Publication

EP 0811560 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97108649 A

Priority

DE 19622689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811560A2] The seal comprises a cap (5) with a central insert with an inward facing sealing skirt (4). This is conical and is gripped between a two part closure (2,4) for the container. When the outer cap is removed the skirt is pulled out of the clamped position and cannot be re-inserted. The conical shape of the skirt prevents re-insertion between the clamping components. The contents of the container are accessed via syringe needles pushed through one of the closure components (2) normally protected by the outer cap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/18; B65D 51/00; B65D 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16B 41/00 (2006.01); B65D 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/02 (2013.01); A61J 1/1406 (2013.01); Y10S 215/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0811560 A2 19971210; EP 0811560 A3 19990331; EP 0811560 B1 20001025; AT 197139 T 20001115; DE 19622689 A1 19971211; ES 2152053 T3 20010116; JP 4458561 B2 20100428; JP H1061648 A 19980306; US 6095355 A 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130529

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130528

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130528

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702519

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130528

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197139 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120607

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120518

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Free text: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#ELSE-KROENER-STRASSE 1#61352 BAD HOMBURG V.D.H. (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#ELSE-KROENER-STRASSE 1#61352 BAD HOMBURG V.D.H. (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152053 T3

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702519 20001130

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197139 T 20001115

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990628

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990628

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI