Global Patent Index - EP 0811712 B1

EP 0811712 B1 2000-04-05 - Thread clamp for a feeding gripper and feeding gripper with such a clamp

Title (en)

Thread clamp for a feeding gripper and feeding gripper with such a clamp

Title (de)

Fadenklemme für einen Bringergreifer und Bringergreifer mit Fadenklemme

Title (fr)

Pince-fil pour griffe d'amenée et griffe d'amenée avec un tel pince-fil

Publication

EP 0811712 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810374 A

Priority

EP 96810374 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811712A1] The yarn clamp, to hold and carry the weft across the shed of a gripper loom, has a deflection unit (15) at the longitudinal side of the first holder (11) to form an initial deflection point (54) for the yarn (3) near the opening (24). A guide body (16), parallel to the deflector (15), forms a second deflection point (55) for the yarn (3). Both deflection points (54,55) are at different levels, to give a S-shaped deflection for the yarn, and form a clamping section for the yarn (3) between the deflection points (54,55). The deflector (15) is of an elastic material, and especially of spring steel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0811712 A1 19971210; EP 0811712 B1 20000405; DE 59604891 D1 20000511; JP 4071844 B2 20080402; JP H1053935 A 19980224

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-06-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604891

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-05-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990224

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980512

1998-04-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT