Global Patent Index - EP 0811741 B1

EP 0811741 B1 2001-12-05 - Sliding door, window or the like

Title (en)

Sliding door, window or the like

Title (de)

Schiebetür, Schiebefenster od.dgl.

Title (fr)

Ouvrant coulissant d'une porte, fenêtre ou analogue

Publication

EP 0811741 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107610 A

Priority

DE 29609869 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811741A2] The sliding door has a control arm (27) which is formed relative to its pivotable joint (29) on the fixed base (17, 17a) as a three-armed lever (62-64). One lever arm (62) of the control arm grips the extension arm (20). The other two lever arms (63,64) are assigned to the drive and positioning cam (33) in two different control curve regions (67,68). The two regions are set at different height levels and partially in different longitudinal sections (67a,67b,68a-c).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/10; E05D 15/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/1013 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29609869 U1 19960725; AT 210238 T 20011215; DK 0811741 T3 20020304; EP 0811741 A2 19971210; EP 0811741 A3 19990421; EP 0811741 B1 20011205; PL 320357 A1 19971208

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEGENIA-FRANK K.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEGENIA-FRANK K.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-05-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2005-03-26 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20050326

2004-05-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-12-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-12-29 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-05-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020527

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020524

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020425

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705618 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210238 T 20011215

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE