Global Patent Index - EP 0811745 B1

EP 0811745 B1 2002-09-04 - Steering device for a directional drilling tool

Title (en)

Steering device for a directional drilling tool

Title (de)

Steuergerät für ein Richtbohrwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle pour un outil de forage directionnel

Publication

EP 0811745 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109136 A

Priority

EP 96109136 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811745A1] A steering unit for a drilling tool used especially with a wrapped-tubing drillstring. Its tubular outer casing (1) accepts: an orientation device (4), measurement and control unit (6), measurement section (7), electronic signal processing section (8) and control section (9). A first external casing section is connected to the borehole end of the drilling line by a connecting section (10). There is a second external casing section (3) immediately axially adjacent to the first (2), with a bearing section (18) permitting rotation about the long central axis (21). The orientation device (4) can be rotated through the first external housing section (2) and has a section (17) connecting to the directed drilling tool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/06; E21B 47/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/06 (2006.01); E21B 47/01 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/01 (2013.01); E21B 7/06 (2013.01); E21B 7/067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0811745 A1 19971210; EP 0811745 B1 20020904; CA 2206926 A1 19971207; CA 2206926 C 20070821; DE 59609624 D1 20021010; NO 311698 B1 20020107; NO 972628 A 19971208; NO 972628 D0 19970606; US 5934383 A 19990810

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160606

2016-06-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160606

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150603

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140609

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59609624

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110607

2012-01-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120101

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609624 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-03-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000202

1998-04-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980204

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL