Global Patent Index - EP 0811806 B1

EP 0811806 B1 2000-11-22 - Door for closing the muffle of a baking oven

Title (en)

Door for closing the muffle of a baking oven

Title (de)

Tür zum Verschliessen der Ofenmuffel eines Back- und Bratofens

Title (fr)

Porte pour fermer une moufle d'un four de cuisson

Publication

EP 0811806 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107487 A

Priority

  • DE 19622580 A
  • DE 19622581 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811806A1] The door has an operating handle, a transparent plate (1) of glass or similar material forming the door front and at least two carrier elements (4,5). The carrier elements are attached to the inside (3) of the plate by adhesive and the operating handle is attached to the carrier elements. Each carrier element has an extension piece which extends over the top of the door front plate. The operating handle is attached to the extensions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/02 (2006.01); F24C 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/006 (2013.01); F24C 15/024 (2013.01); F24C 15/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0811806 A1 19971210; EP 0811806 B1 20001122; EP 0811806 B2 20040218

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702655

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702655

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120507

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120507

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX ROTHENBURG GMBH FACTORY AND DEVELOPMEN

- Free text: AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH#MUGGENHOFERSTRASSE 135#90429 NUERNBERG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ELECTROLUX ROTHENBURG GMBH FACTORY AND DEVELOPMENT#FUERTHER STRASSE 246#90429 NUERNBERG (DE)

2004-11-19 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-06-09 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2004-03-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2004-02-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH ZENTRALABTE

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-02-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702655 20001228

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000517

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971017

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI