Global patent index - EP 0811807 A3

EP 0811807 A3 2000-03-15 - Movable holding device for a food support

Title (en)

Movable holding device for a food support

Title (de)

Bewegbare Haltevorrichtung für einen Gargutträger

Title (fr)

Dispositif de suspension mobile pour un support d'alimentation

Publication

EP 0811807 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97108996 A

Priority

DE 19622608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0811807A2] The tray (8) is supported on two parallel support arms (16,17) on each side with the arms arranged in a parallelogram. The arms are pivoted on two bottom bars (11) which are supported on the floor of the oven and whose inner ends are hooked (30) to clip into grips in the rear of the oven. The bottom support arms have profiles to rest on the floor of the oven. The pivot points of the support arms are positioned so that the tray has stable support positions in both the retracted and extended settings. The support arms can include support springs to stabilise the end positions. The whole system can be removed for cleaning.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0811807 A2 19971210; EP 0811807 A3 20000315; US 5746118 A 19980505

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-12-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE