Global Patent Index - EP 0812032 B1

EP 0812032 B1 2001-04-25 - Terminal for comb-shaped bus bar, especially for modular electrical apparatus

Title (en)

Terminal for comb-shaped bus bar, especially for modular electrical apparatus

Title (de)

Anschlussbuchse für kammförmige Sammelschiene, insbesondere für modulare elektrische Geräte

Title (fr)

Borne d'arrivée pour barre d'alimentation en forme de peigne, notamment pour appareils électriques modulaires

Publication

EP 0812032 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401195 A

Priority

FR 9606994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0812032A1] The terminal includes a pin (22) which extends linearly from a connecting terminal (18) for an electrical conductor. The additional thickness (E'2) on the upper surface (30) of the end section (29) of the pin relative to the thinner root section (28) is greater than the additional thickness (E"2) on the lower surface (31). An insulating cover (17) surrounds at least some of the live part (16) with an opening (20) at right angles to the conductor input (21). It has two side extensions (35,36); the lower of these is hinged along its upper side by a thinned section so as to enclose the root by snapping together (41,42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/26 (2006.01); H01R 11/07 (2006.01); H01R 4/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2675 (2013.01); H01R 11/07 (2013.01); H01R 4/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0812032 A1 19971210; EP 0812032 B1 20010425; AT 200835 T 20010515; DE 69704641 D1 20010531; DE 69704641 T2 20010809; ES 2155972 T3 20010601; FR 2749709 A1 19971212; FR 2749709 B1 19980904

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEGRAND SNC

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060530

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060530

2006-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060530

2005-06-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050609

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155972 T3

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704641 20010531

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-05-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT

2001-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200835 T 20010515

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001002

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980110

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT