Global Patent Index - EP 0812035 B1

EP 0812035 B1 2002-09-25 - Electrical contact socket with reinforced structure

Title (en)

Electrical contact socket with reinforced structure

Title (de)

Elektrische Steckbuchse mit verstärkter Struktur

Title (fr)

Borne de contact électrique femelle à structure renforcée

Publication

EP 0812035 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97108770 A

Priority

FR 9606787 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0812035A1] The connector includes the reinforced structure construction which has a square forward plug section (26) made from a single metallic sheet. The side walls are formed by bending half sections. There are two flanges at the front. These flanges bend in to connect with the inner of the male connector. The flange width is the same as the diameter of the male connector inner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/115

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/113 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0812035 A1 19971210; EP 0812035 B1 20020925; AT 225089 T 20021015; BR 9703428 A 19980707; CA 2204294 A1 19971203; CA 2204294 C 20041109; DE 69715732 D1 20021031; DE 69715732 T2 20030605; ES 2181949 T3 20030301; FR 2749442 A1 19971205; FR 2749442 B1 19980710; JP 4040716 B2 20080130; JP H1055840 A 19980224; US 5951339 A 19990914

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080603

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070619

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-06-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070507

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-24 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-03-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-03-24 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2005-03-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181949 T3

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715732 20021031

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225089 T 20021015

2000-06-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000509

1998-08-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-08-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971229

1997-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE