Global Patent Index - EP 0812204 A4

EP 0812204 A4 2000-05-03 - CODOMINANCE-MEDIATED TOXINS

Title (en)

CODOMINANCE-MEDIATED TOXINS

Title (de)

KODOMINANZ-KONTROLLIERTE TOXINE

Title (fr)

TOXINES CONTROLEES PAR CODOMINANCE

Publication

EP 0812204 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96907881 A

Priority

  • US 9602271 W
  • US 39743595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9626733A1] Disclosed is a new class of therapeutic reagents referred to as codominance-mediated toxins. These reagents include (1) an effector domain; (2) a first codominant signaling moiety located proximately to a binding domain for a first protein; and (3) a second codminant signaling moiety located proximately to a binding domain for a second protein. The ability to mask and unmask the signaling moiety by the binding of intracellurar reagents, and the codominance of signaling moieties are exploited to design a novel class of reagents having previously unattainable selectivity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; C07H 17/00; C07K 14/00; C07K 19/00; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/62; C12P 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/43 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 19/00 (2013.01); C12N 15/62 (2013.01); C07K 2319/09 (2013.01); C07K 2319/55 (2013.01); C07K 2319/95 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 9418332 A2 19940818 - US HEALTH [US]
  • [Y] WO 9118096 A1 19911128 - MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]
  • [Y] WO 8909829 A2 19891019 - MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]
  • [XDY] VITETTA E S ET AL: "Immunotoxins: magic bullets or misguided missiles ?.", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1993 JUN) 14 (6) 252-9. REF: 51, XP002130421
  • [XY] COOK J P ET AL: "BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE INTERLEUKIN 2-RICIN A CHAIN FUSION PROTEINS MAYREQUIRE INTRACELLULAR PROTEOLYTIC CLEAVAGE TO EXHIBIT A CYTOTOXIC EFFECT", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, vol. 4, no. 6, 1 November 1993 (1993-11-01), pages 440 - 447, XP000417282, ISSN: 1043-1802
  • [A] JOHNSON E S ET AL: "Ubiquitin as a degradation signal.", EMBO JOURNAL, (1992 FEB) 11 (2) 497-505., XP002130422
  • See also references of WO 9626733A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9626733 A1 19960906; AU 5132996 A 19960918; EP 0812204 A1 19971217; EP 0812204 A4 20000503; JP H11502407 A 19990302

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040329

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030317

2000-05-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 38/00 A, 7C 07H 17/00 B, 7C 07K 14/00 B, 7C 12P 21/06 B, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7C 12N 15/62 B, 7C 07K 19/00 B

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970925

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE