Global Patent Index - EP 0812278 B1

EP 0812278 B1 2000-05-17 - RAILWAY BRAKE VALVE INCLUDING AN APPLICATION ACCELERATING DEVICE

Title (en)

RAILWAY BRAKE VALVE INCLUDING AN APPLICATION ACCELERATING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHIENENFAHRZEUG-STEUERVENTIL MIT BREMSBESCHLEUNIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR DE FREINAGE FERROVIAIRE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF D'ACCELERATION AU SERRAGE

Publication

EP 0812278 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96905887 A

Priority

  • FR 9600315 W
  • FR 9502477 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9627515A1] A pressurised-fluid brake valve for a rail vehicle, including a main device and an accelerating device (29, 31) for connecting the main brake pipe (pipe 1) to the atmosphere. The accelerating device is opened when the main device begins to output a brake pressure to the braking members (pipe 4), in order to connect the main brake pipe (pipe 1) to the atmosphere, and it is closed when the pressure in a sensing chamber (26) connected to the braking members (pipe 4) exceeds a predetermined level, in order to isolate the main brake pipe (pipe 1) from the atmosphere.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 15/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9627515 A1 19960912; AT 192982 T 20000615; AU 4946996 A 19960923; DE 69608423 D1 20000621; DE 69608423 T2 20010222; EP 0812278 A1 19971217; EP 0812278 B1 20000517; ES 2148735 T3 20001016; FR 2731192 A1 19960906; FR 2731192 B1 19970509

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-06-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160624

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160228

2016-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 192982 T

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-03-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160228

2016-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69608423

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148735 T3

2000-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-08-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATMED AG

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608423 20000621

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192982 T 20000615

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAB WABCO

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980422

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971006

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL PT SE