Global Patent Index - EP 0812348 A4

EP 0812348 A4 2000-04-12 - LAUNDRY PRETREATMENT WITH PEROXIDE BLEACHES CONTAINING CHELATORS FOR IRON, COPPER OR MANGANESE FOR REDUCED FABRIC DAMAGE

Title (en)

LAUNDRY PRETREATMENT WITH PEROXIDE BLEACHES CONTAINING CHELATORS FOR IRON, COPPER OR MANGANESE FOR REDUCED FABRIC DAMAGE

Title (de)

WÄSCHEVORBEHANDLUNG MIT PEROXYBLEICHMITTELN ENTHALTEND KOMPLEXBILDNER FÜR EISEN, KUPFER ODER MANGAN FÜR REDUZIERTEN GEWEBESCHADEN

Title (fr)

PRETRAITEMENT DU LINGE AVEC DES CHELATEURS CONTENANT UN AGENT DE BLANCHIMENT PEROXYDE POUR LE FER, LE CUIVRE OU LE MANGANESE, POUR DIMINUER LA DETERIORATION DU TISSU

Publication

EP 0812348 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96906534 A

Priority

  • EP 96906534 A
  • EP 95870018 A
  • US 9602219 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9626999A1] The present invention relates to the use of a liquid composition comprising a peroxygen bleach and a compound chelating copper and/or iron and/or manganese, for pretreating fabrics before said fabrics are washed, whereby the loss of tensile strength in said fabrics is reduced. The present invention further encompasses a process for pretreating soiled fabrics as well as compositions suitable to be used in said process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06L 3/02; C11D 3/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 3/36 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 7/18 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 7/36 (2006.01); C11D 17/08 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 3/33 (2013.01); C11D 3/361 (2013.01); C11D 3/364 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9626999 A1 19960906; AT 230042 T 20030115; AU 4988296 A 19960918; AU 711340 B2 19991014; BR 9607400 A 19980630; CA 2213633 A1 19960906; CA 2213633 C 20020122; CN 1176656 A 19980318; CZ 9702702 A3 19980114; DE 69625471 D1 20030130; DE 69625471 T2 20031106; EP 0812348 A1 19971217; EP 0812348 A4 20000412; EP 0812348 B1 20021218; ES 2185764 T3 20030501; FI 973517 A0 19970827; FI 973517 A 19971027; HU 9800073 A2 19980428; JP H11502549 A 19990302; KR 100249610 B1 20000315; MX 9706537 A 19971129; NO 973910 A 19970826; NO 973910 D0 19970826; PL 322021 A1 19980105; SK 115597 A3 19980603; TR 9700867 T1 19980121; ZA 9601586 B 19960906

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110221

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110220

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69625471

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110220

2011-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110902

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110220

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100107

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20091230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-09-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1006231

2003-12-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185764 T3

2003-03-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400069

2003-02-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625471 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69625471 P 20030130

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230042 T 20030115

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010402

2000-04-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 06L 3/02 A, 7C 11D 3/39 B

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970811

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE