Global Patent Index - EP 0812386 B1

EP 0812386 B1 2000-01-05 - DEVICE FOR EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION WITH A CLOSURE MEMBER WHICH CAN BE ACTUATED IN THE INTAKE DUCT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION WITH A CLOSURE MEMBER WHICH CAN BE ACTUATED IN THE INTAKE DUCT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGASRÜCKFÜHRUNG MIT EINEM IM ANSAUGKANAL BETÄTIGBAREN SCHLIESSELEMENT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RECYCLAGE DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT COMPORTANT UN ELEMENT DE FERMETURE ACTIONNABLE DANS LE CANAL D'ASPIRATION

Publication

EP 0812386 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96933317 A

Priority

  • DE 9601563 W
  • DE 19549107 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5785034A] PCT No. PCT/DE96/01563 Sec. 371 Date Aug. 29, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Aug. 29, 1997 PCT Filed Aug. 23, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/24522 PCT Pub. Date Jul. 10, 1997The invention relates to an apparatus for exhaust gas recirculation having an exhaust gas delivery conduit connected to an intake conduit, wherein the exhaust gas discharge conduit in the intake conduit is openable and closable via a closing element actuated by an adjusting drive. To that end, a substantially cylindrical exhaust gas delivery tube, as part of an exhaust gas delivery neck protrudes into the intake conduit approximately perpendicular to the fresh gas stream, which has an outlet opening in its cylindrical wall. Disposed above the outlet opening is a rotary slide bell, as the closing element, which at least regionally surrounds the exhaust gas delivery tube protruding into the intake conduit. The rotary slide bell is coupled to an electric pivoting motor acting as an adjusting drive. The apparatus is one in which only minimal forces caused by the flow of exhaust gas and fresh gas act upon the closing element and its adjusting drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07; F16K 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/21 (2016.01); F02M 26/54 (2016.01); F02M 26/70 (2016.01); F16K 3/26 (2006.01); F16K 31/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/70 (2016.02); F02M 26/21 (2016.02); F02M 26/54 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5785034 A 19980728; DE 19549107 A1 19970703; DE 59604117 D1 20000210; EP 0812386 A1 19971217; EP 0812386 B1 20000105; JP H11504411 A 19990420; WO 9724522 A1 19970710

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050823

2002-06-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-08-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010823

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001026

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000822

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000817

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000309

2000-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604117 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980316

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980112

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT