Global Patent Index - EP 0812409 B1

EP 0812409 B1 2000-01-26 - CONTROLLING A COMBUSTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

CONTROLLING A COMBUSTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

REGELUNG EINER BRENNANLAGE

Title (fr)

REGULATION D'UN SYSTEME DE COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 0812409 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96902387 A

Priority

  • GB 9600348 W
  • GB 9503065 A
  • GB 9525197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2298060A] Apparatus for controlling a fully-premixed burner combustion system is arranged to control the fuel supply 21 at one of a number of predetermined rates of flow and a fan 18 so that it operates at one of a number of predetermined speeds, each fan speed corresponding to a particular predetermined value of the fuel flow rate. The speed of the fan is increased from zero and is adjusted to a reference fan speed, but the fan is switched off if the maximum fan speed is reached without the required air flow being achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/18; F23N 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/02 (2006.01); F23N 3/08 (2006.01); F23N 5/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/18 (2006.01); F23N 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/003 (2013.01); F23N 1/022 (2013.01); F23N 3/082 (2013.01); F23N 5/184 (2013.01); F23N 5/24 (2013.01); F23N 2023/08 (2013.01); F23N 2025/08 (2013.01); F23N 2033/08 (2013.01); F23N 2035/06 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0124330 A1 19841107 - AUTOFLAME ENG LTD [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2298060 A 19960821; GB 2298060 B 19981202; GB 9603087 D0 19960410; AU 4672596 A 19960904; AU 696298 B2 19980903; CA 2212499 A1 19960822; DE 69606390 D1 20000302; DE 69606390 T2 20000727; EP 0812409 A1 19971217; EP 0812409 B1 20000126; ES 2142045 T3 20000401; JP H10504379 A 19980428; WO 9625629 A1 19960822

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050214

2002-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-02-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010901

2001-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010901

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BG P.L.C.

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010615

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142045 T3

2000-03-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000313

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000308

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606390 20000302

2000-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-02-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000223

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-02-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-02-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-02-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1998-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971209

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970917

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE