Global Patent Index - EP 0812783 B1

EP 0812783 B1 2000-04-26 - Condensation water recovery system inside containers and container equipped with such a condensation system

Title (en)

Condensation water recovery system inside containers and container equipped with such a condensation system

Title (de)

Kondenswasser-Rekuperationssystem in Behälter und Behälter ausgerüstet miteinem derartigen Rekuperationssytem

Title (fr)

Système de récupération d'eau de condensation à l'intérieur de conteneurs, et conteneur équipé d'un tel système de récupération

Publication

EP 0812783 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97401316 A

Priority

FR 9607267 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0812783A1] System for recovering condensation from a container, comprises a supple impermeable element (1) with dimensions corresponding to a horizontal cross-section of the container (7). (1) is attached by fastenings (9) to two opposite walls holding it under tension parallel to the top (8) of the container and slightly beneath it. The surface of the supple element is connected through apertures (3, 3') to at least one sealed chamber (2, 2') where condensation is trapped and stored. Preferably the long sides of the supple element (1) are attached to the long sides of the container walls. The sealed chambers (2, 2') made from lengthwise folds, closed at their ends lie lengthwise. The supple element and its flap are made from a synthetic fabric such as polypropylene. A rod and small cords reinforce the system, that is not sealed at the top.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/12 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01); F25D 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/00 (2013.01); F25D 2321/1442 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0812783 A1 19971217; EP 0812783 B1 20000426; DE 69701768 D1 20000531; DE 69701768 T2 20001123; ES 2147970 T3 20001001; FR 2749832 A1 19971219; FR 2749832 B1 19980911; JP H1072089 A 19980317; OA 10490 A 20020415; TW 335385 B 19980701

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040612

2005-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050611

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040611

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DELMAS

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040612

2004-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040611

2004-06-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040611

2004-01-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040115

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-18 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20031118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147970 T3

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2000-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69701768 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990930

1999-09-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONDENSATION WATER RECOVERY SYSTEM INSIDE CONTAINERS AND CONTAINER EQUIPPED WITH SUCH A CONDENSATION SYSTEM

1998-08-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL

1998-08-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL

1998-08-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980615

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI LU NL