Global Patent Index - EP 0812796 B1

EP 0812796 B1 2001-12-12 - Safety apparatus for elevator

Title (en)

Safety apparatus for elevator

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Aufzug

Title (fr)

Appareil de sécurité pour ascenseur

Publication

EP 0812796 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97109147 A

Priority

JP 14962296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0812796A1] A safety apparatus for an elevator of the present invention includes an emergency stopping mechanism (40,41,44,45) for generating a high frictional force to brake the elevator, a driving apparatus (21,51) for operating the emergency stopping mechanism, a cam latch mechanism (32,34,36) for releasing the driving apparatus when the speed of movement of the elevator reaches a critical speed, and a governor (13,14,16,17,30) for activating the cam latch mechanism. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/04; B66B 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/18 (2006.01); B66B 5/04 (2006.01); B66B 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/044 (2013.01); B66B 5/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0812796 A1 19971217; EP 0812796 B1 20011212; CN 1092129 C 20021009; CN 1180041 A 19980429; DE 69708976 D1 20020124; DE 69708976 T2 20020725; JP 3532349 B2 20040531; JP H09328268 A 19971222; KR 100227251 B1 19991101; TW 348170 B 19981221; US 6003636 A 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69708976

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69708976

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-01-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120101

2011-08-18 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69708976

- Effective date: 20110628

2011-08-18 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69708976

- Effective date: 20110506

2010-10-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080605

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080605

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-05-07 [REG GB 727B] CASE DECIDED BY THE COMPTROLLER ** SPECIFICATION AMENDED (SECT. 27/1977)

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-20 [REG GB 727A] APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION NOW OPEN TO OPPOSITION (SECT. 27/1977)

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [REG GB 727] APPLICATION MADE FOR AMENDMENT OF SPECIFICATION (SECT. 27/1977)

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69708976 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000522

1998-08-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

1998-08-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971029

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL