Global Patent Index - EP 0812939 B1

EP 0812939 B1 2001-04-04 - Drawing gripper for gripper loom

Title (en)

Drawing gripper for gripper loom

Title (de)

Holergreifer für eine Greiferwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Griffe tireuse pour métier à tisser à griffes

Publication

EP 0812939 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810399 A

Priority

EP 96810399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0812939A1] Grip to pick up a weft delivered into the shed of a gripper loom comprises a U-shaped base body (1) with a hook (2). The deflection edge (18), for the warps is within the U-shaped body (1) on the longitudinal line of the clamping tongue (3). The deflection edge (18) projects over the top of the body (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/236 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0812939 A1 19971217; EP 0812939 B1 20010404; DE 59606724 D1 20010510; JP H1053937 A 19980224

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2004-07-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040709

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040604

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606724 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

2000-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000308

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980519

1998-04-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1997-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT;LV;SI