Global patent index - EP 0812943 A3

EP 0812943 A3 2000-10-18 - Textile web for use as an inner layer of a mould for concrete

Title (en)

Textile web for use as an inner layer of a mould for concrete

Title (de)

Textiles Flächengebilde zur Verwendung als Betonformzwischenlage

Title (fr)

Etoffe textile pour une couche interne d'un moule pour béton

Publication

EP 0812943 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97108682 A

Priority

DE 19623584 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0812943A2] Concrete mould lining, containing nonwoven fabric made of fibres with a titre of 0.7-3 (preferably 1-2.5, more preferably 1-2) dtex, with a maximum tensile strength (measured on a strip 5 cm wide) of at least 300 (preferably at least 400, more preferably at least 500) N in the longitudinal direction and at least 250 (preferably at least 300, more preferably at least 350) N in the transverse direction, and a surface quality corresponding to a pore size of 1-80 (preferably 5-60) microns. Also claimed is (i) a process for the production of this lining by (a) making non-woven fabric from fibres as above and (b) compacting the fabric on a calender to obtain the required strength and surface quality; (ii) concrete moulds containing this fabric, for the production of patterned or smooth concrete surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 3/16; D04H 1/54; D04H 3/14; E04G 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/54 (2012.01); D04H 1/544 (2012.01); D04H 1/549 (2012.01); D04H 1/55 (2012.01); D04H 3/007 (2012.01); D04H 3/009 (2012.01); D04H 3/011 (2012.01); D04H 3/14 (2012.01); D06N 7/04 (2006.01); E04G 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 3/011 (2013.01); B28B 7/368 (2013.01); B28B 7/46 (2013.01); D04H 1/54 (2013.01); D04H 1/544 (2013.01); D04H 1/549 (2013.01); D04H 1/55 (2013.01); D04H 3/007 (2013.01); D04H 3/009 (2013.01); D04H 3/14 (2013.01); E04G 9/10 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249982 (2015.04); Y10T 428/268 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0812943 A2 19971217; EP 0812943 A3 20001018; DE 19623584 A1 19971218; DE 19623584 B4 20041014; TR 9700491 A2 19980121; US 5820775 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081202

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011126

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011126

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001125

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 04H 3/16 A, 7D 04H 1/54 B, 7E 04G 9/10 B, 7D 04H 3/14 B

1999-11-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNS MANVILLE INTERNATIONAL, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR IT LI LU NL SE