Global Patent Index - EP 0812973 B1

EP 0812973 B1 2004-12-29 - Door hinge element and door hinge manufactured from such an element

Title (en)

Door hinge element and door hinge manufactured from such an element

Title (de)

Türbandteil und daraus hergestelltes Türband

Title (fr)

Elément de penture de porte et penture de porte fabriqué d'un tel élément

Publication

EP 0812973 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109424 A

Priority

DE 29610368 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0812973A2] The hinge has a sleeve (3,30) containing the hinge bolt (35), the sleeve material having a tendency not to melt in the case of fire. The sleeve is fabricated separately from the flaps (2,31) and is joined to them by welding. At least one end-side end part of the sleeve has an injection moulded, easily fusible plastic container going through the main bearing ring (32). A spare bearing ring (33) fits into the container and is made of poorly fusible material. In the event of a fire the main bearing ring melts and the spare bearing ring supports the sleeve which consists of a separately produced body welded to the loop. The container consists of a recess in the main bearing ring left free during injection moulding. The sleeve has at least one plastic-filled slot on its end holding the main bearing ring, and has a plastic inner casing (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/14 (2006.01); E05D 9/00 (2006.01); E05D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 9/005 (2013.01); E05D 5/14 (2013.01); E05D 9/00 (2013.01); E05D 11/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29610368 U1 19971016; AT 286193 T 20050115; DE 59712143 D1 20050203; DK 0812973 T3 20050404; EP 0812973 A2 19971217; EP 0812973 A3 19980318; EP 0812973 B1 20041229; ES 2235204 T3 20050701

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060611

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HEINRICH WILKE G.M.B.H. *HEWI

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050613

2006-03-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050611

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-11-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-04 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235204 T3

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-06-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050612

2005-06-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050611

2005-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050611

2005-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050611

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-04-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-02-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712143 P 20050203

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990219

1998-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1998-12-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980425

1998-03-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE