Global Patent Index - EP 0813123 B1

EP 0813123 B1 2001-12-05 - Cleaning apparatus for removing charged liquid toner particles

Title (en)

Cleaning apparatus for removing charged liquid toner particles

Title (de)

Reinigungsvorrichtung zum Entfernen von geladenen Flüssigtonerpartikeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage pour enlever des particules de toner liquide

Publication

EP 0813123 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97202298 A

Priority

  • EP 97202298 A
  • CA 2153311 A
  • EP 93902581 A
  • NL 9300010 W
  • SG 1995002007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9416364A1] Imaging apparatus including: an image-forming surface (16) having formed thereon a latent electrostatic image, the latent electrostatic image including image regions at a first voltage and background regions at a second voltage; a developer surface (21) charged to a third voltage intermediate the first and second voltages and having a second surface urged against and adapted for operative engagement with the image-forming surface at a development region; an applicator assembly (23) operative to apply a layer of concentrated liquid toner comprising charged toner particles and carrier liquid onto the developer surface (21); a developer operative to develop the latent image by transferring less than the total thickness of the layer of concentrated liquid toner from the developer surface (21) to the image regions of the image-forming surface (16) thereby to form a developed image on the image-forming surface (16); and apparatus for transferring the developed image from the image-forming surface to a final substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/10; G03G 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/10 (2013.01); G03G 15/101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9416364 A1 19940721; AT 164953 T 19980415; CA 2387330 A1 19940721; CA 2387330 C 20051206; CA 2387333 A1 19940721; CA 2387333 C 20060516; DE 69331288 D1 20020117; DE 69331288 T2 20020718; EP 0813123 A2 19971217; EP 0813123 A3 19980114; EP 0813123 B1 20011205; EP 1117014 A2 20010718; EP 1117014 A3 20010905; EP 1117014 B1 20050914; SG 93172 A1 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130110

2013-01-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20130110

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090111

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69331288 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 678202

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CLEANING APPARATUS FOR REMOVING CHARGED LIQUID TONER PARTICLES

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990323

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980714

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-12-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 678202

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT