Global Patent Index - EP 0813173 A3

EP 0813173 A3 2000-06-14 - Electronic purse application system and method thereof

Title (en)

Electronic purse application system and method thereof

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zur Anwendung von elektronischen Geldbörsen

Title (fr)

Système et méthode de mise en application de porte-monnaies électroniques

Publication

EP 0813173 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97304124 A

Priority

JP 15367396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0813173A2] On the basis of information which is the standard for transaction conditions such as amount information in an IC card as well as age information registered in the IC card or a predetermined contract destination, a transaction when electronic money is used and restrictions and conditions for program audience are automatically set. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/08; G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/12 (2006.01); G06Q 20/06 (2012.01); G06Q 20/10 (2012.01); G06Q 20/20 (2012.01); G06Q 20/34 (2012.01); G06Q 20/40 (2012.01); G07F 7/02 (2006.01); G07F 7/08 (2006.01); G07F 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/025 (2013.01); G06Q 20/06 (2013.01); G06Q 20/10 (2013.01); G06Q 20/102 (2013.01); G06Q 20/105 (2013.01); G06Q 20/108 (2013.01); G06Q 20/1085 (2013.01); G06Q 20/20 (2013.01); G06Q 20/204 (2013.01); G06Q 20/342 (2013.01); G06Q 20/4014 (2013.01); G06Q 40/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0813173 A2 19971217; EP 0813173 A3 20000614; AU 2487297 A 19971218; AU 694694 B2 19980723; CN 1113312 C 20030702; CN 1182918 A 19980527; JP H103568 A 19980106; NZ 328054 A 19980527; US 2002029380 A1 20020307; US 6345263 B1 20020205; US 7346579 B2 20080318

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100915

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB IT NL

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 7/08 A, 7G 07F 7/10 B

1998-09-16 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 7/08

1998-09-02 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

1997-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970702

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL