Global Patent Index - EP 0813230 A3

EP 0813230 A3 2001-05-30 - Device for dry cleaning dust soiled objects for carrying and keeping semi-conductor wafers

Title (en)

Device for dry cleaning dust soiled objects for carrying and keeping semi-conductor wafers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trockenreinigen von staubverschmutzten Hilfsgegenständen zur Handhabung und Aufbewahrung von Halbleiterwafern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyage par voie sèche d'objets souillés de poussière pour maintenance et stockage de plaquettes semi-conductrices

Publication

EP 0813230 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97109257 A

Priority

DE 19623766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0813230A2] An apparatus for dry cleaning a dust-laden wafer handling and holding article, especially a quartz carrier (1), consists of a housing (2) having a reception opening (3) closed by a cover (4), a reception area (5) for the article and a spatially separate collection area (6), one or more gas inlet nozzles (8) being provided in the reception area (5) and a gas suction opening (19) being provided in the collection area (6) so that the article can be swept by a cleaning gas. Several gas inlet nozzles (8) are provided in the housing cover (4) which contains channels (9) for supplying cleaning gas to the nozzles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/00; B08B 5/02; B08B 9/08; B08B 9/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/67028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0813230 A2 19971217; EP 0813230 A3 20010530; EP 0813230 B1 20060726; DE 19623766 A1 19971218; DE 59712698 D1 20060907; US 5991965 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59712698

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-02-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060726

2007-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712698 P 20060907

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2006-07-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-07-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR DRY CLEANING DUST SOILED OBJECTS FOR CARRYING AND KEEPING SEMI-CONDUCTOR WAFERS

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICRONAS SEMICONDUCTOR HOLDING AG

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01L 21/00 A, 7B 08B 5/02 B, 7B 08B 9/08 B, 7B 08B 9/34 B

1998-05-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICRONAS SEMICONDUCTOR HOLDING AG

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL