Global Patent Index - EP 0813378 B1

EP 0813378 B1 2001-04-18 - HEIGHT-ADJUSTMENT OF BACK-REST

Title (en)

HEIGHT-ADJUSTMENT OF BACK-REST

Title (de)

HÖHENVERSTELLUNG FÜR RÜCKENLEHNEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE EN HAUTEUR D'UN DOSSIER

Publication

EP 0813378 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96946053 A

Priority

  • DE 9602350 W
  • DE 29600332 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5882077A] PCT No. PCT/DE96/02350 Sec. 371 Date Nov. 25, 1997 Sec. 102(e) Date Nov. 25, 1997 PCT Filed Dec. 7, 1996 PCT Pub. No. WO97/24958 PCT Pub. Date Jul. 17, 1997The invention concerns the height-adjustment of the back-rests of chairs, especially office chairs, consisting of a housing (1) in which a flat back-rest carrier (2) is held by a ball-stop clamp (3, 4), the back-rest carrier (2) being provided with a series of indentations or holes (3) arranged behind one another in an axial direction for the stop balls (4) which are held in the indentations or holes (3) by means of a spring-loaded clamping bevel (5'). The clamping bevel (5') can be brought out of contact by a push-button (8) guided sideways from outside the housing against the spring force, spring-loaded means (10, 11) being arranged in the housing (1) for the prevention of sideways play of the back-rest carrier (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/402 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29600332 U1 19960307; EP 0813378 A1 19971229; EP 0813378 B1 20010418; NO 974049 A 19970903; NO 974049 D0 19970903; US 5882077 A 19990316; WO 9724958 A1 19970717

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-07-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-12-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021208

2002-12-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021207

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-17 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-09-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-07-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606803

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

2001-04-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000803

1998-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971216

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT SE