Global patent index - EP 0813379 B1

EP 0813379 B1 2000-01-19 - FRAME MATTRESS HAVING A REMOVABLE MATTRESS COVER AND A TURNABLE MATTRESS

Title (en)

FRAME MATTRESS HAVING A REMOVABLE MATTRESS COVER AND A TURNABLE MATTRESS

Title (de)

LIEGEFLÄCHENRAHMEN MIT ABNEHMBAREM MATRATZENÜBERZUG UND WENDBARER MATRATZE

Title (fr)

MATELAS A CADRE COMPRENANT UNE ENVELOPPE AMOVIBLE ET UN MATELAS POUVANT ETRE RETOURNE

Publication

EP 0813379 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96906960 A

Priority

  • NO 9600049 W
  • NO 950924 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9628071A1] Frame mattress comprising a frame (1), a spring inlay (2) covered by a cloth (3), a main mattress (4) of per se known type and a fitted cover (5) mounted over the whole construction. The frame mattress is characterised in that the fitted cover is removably fixed and that the main mattress is turnable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/00 (2013.01); A47C 31/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9628071 A1 19960919; DE 69606283 D1 20000224; DE 69606283 T2 20000914; DE 69606283 T3 20030828; DK 0813379 T3 20000508; DK 0813379 T4 20030422; EP 0813379 A2 19971229; EP 0813379 B1 20000119; EP 0813379 B2 20030319; NO 307641 B1 20000508; NO 307641 B2 20000508; NO 950924 A 19960911; NO 950924 D0 19950310

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-03-07 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-02 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-03-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69606283

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150310

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WONDERLAND AS

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-09-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: STOKKE AS

2004-02-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-04-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-04-08 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2003-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: STOKKE GRUPPEN AS

2003-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WONDERLAND AS

2003-03-19 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI NL SE

2003-01-06 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: STOKKE GRUPPEN AS

2002-10-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: STOKKE GRUPPEN AS

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCAPA BEDDING AB

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCAPA BEDDING AB

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-05-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606283

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI NL SE

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981029

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970826

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI NL SE