Global Patent Index - EP 0813510 A4

EP 0813510 A4 2000-07-26 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ENHANCING FORMYLTETRAHYDROPTEROYLPOLYGLUTAMATE IN PLANTS

Title (en)

METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ENHANCING FORMYLTETRAHYDROPTEROYLPOLYGLUTAMATE IN PLANTS

Title (de)

VERFAHRENEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES FORMYLTETRAHYDROPTEROYLPOLYGLUTAMATS IN PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT D'ACCROITRE LE FORMYLTETRAHYDROPTEROYLPOLYGLUTAMATE DANS DES PLANTES

Publication

EP 0813510 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96906601 A

Priority

  • US 9602444 W
  • US 39939995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9627572A1] Methods and compositions for enhancing plant growth provide for foliar application of a substance which enhances the accumulation of formyltetrahydropteroylpolyglutamate (C1-THF) in a treated plant. Treatment with substances that contribute to the structure of C1-THF increases the rate and quantity of carbon fixation by the plant. Thereafter, plant growth is further improved either by exposure of the plant to elevated oxygen, illumination and heat or by foliar input of single carbon fragment sources. Optimal results are obtained by combined treatment with a substance that can serve as a sink for C1 fragments produced in the leaf.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C05C 5/00; C05C 9/00; A01N 33/18; A01N 37/04; A01N 37/10; A01N 47/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 35/04 (2006.01); A01N 37/10 (2006.01); A01N 37/18 (2006.01); A01N 37/48 (2006.01); A01N 43/90 (2006.01); A01N 61/00 (2006.01); C05F 11/00 (2006.01); C05F 11/10 (2006.01); C05G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C05G 3/0064 (2013.01); A01N 37/10 (2013.01); A01N 37/48 (2013.01); A01N 43/90 (2013.01); A01N 61/00 (2013.01); C05F 11/10 (2013.01); Y02E 50/343 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 61/00 + A01N 61/00
  2. A01N 43/90 + A01N 43/90 + A01N 37/52 + A01N 37/46 + A01N 37/44 + A01N 37/36 + A01N 37/02 + A01N 31/02 + A01N 47/28
  3. A01N 37/48 + A01N 43/90 + A01N 47/28 + A01N 37/52 + A01N 37/46 + A01N 37/44 + A01N 37/36 + A01N 37/02 + A01N 31/02
  4. A01N 37/10 + A01N 43/90 + A01N 37/52 + A01N 37/46 + A01N 37/44 + A01N 37/36 + A01N 37/02 + A01N 31/02 + A01N 47/28
  5. A01N 37/10 + A01N 2300/00
  6. A01N 37/48 + A01N 2300/00
  7. A01N 43/90 + A01N 2300/00
  8. A01N 61/00 + A01N 2300/00
  9. C05F 11/10 + C05G 3/0064

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9627572 A1 19960912; AR 001154 A1 19970924; AU 4993696 A 19960923; AU 708417 B2 19990805; BR 9607690 A 19980707; CA 2214795 A1 19960912; EP 0813510 A1 19971229; EP 0813510 A4 20000726; IL 117374 A 20020210; IL 117374 D0 19960723; JP H11501608 A 19990209; ZA 9601637 B 19960731

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030310

2000-07-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT

1998-02-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NONOMURA, ARTHUR M.

1998-02-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NISHIO, JOHN N.

1998-02-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BENSON, ANDREW A.

1998-02-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NONOMURA, ARTHUR M.

1998-02-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NISHIO, JOHN N.

1998-02-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BENSON, ANDREW A.

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970923

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT