Global Patent Index - EP 0813670 B1

EP 0813670 B1 2000-06-28 - AXIALLY STEPPED DOUBLE-RING COMBUSTION CHAMBER FOR A GAS TURBINE

Title (en)

AXIALLY STEPPED DOUBLE-RING COMBUSTION CHAMBER FOR A GAS TURBINE

Title (de)

AXIAL GESTUFTE DOPPELRING-BRENNKAMMER EINER GASTURBINE

Title (fr)

CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION A ANNEAU DOUBLE ET ETAGEMENT AXIAL POUR UNE TURBINE A GAZ

Publication

EP 0813670 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96904099 A

Priority

  • DE 19508109 A
  • DE 19600837 A
  • EP 9600895 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9627766A1] The invention concerns an axially stepped annular combustion chamber, in particular for an aircraft gas turbine, the combustion chamber essentially comprising an independent main combustion chamber (5') and an independent pilot combustion chamber (5). Appropriate design of the inner boundary walls (6a, 6b) of the pilot combustion chamber (5) ensures that the combustion gases thereof enter the main combustion zone (5') substantially in the radial direction. As a result, optimum mixing of the fuel and air is thus ensured in this main combustion zone or main combustion chamber (5'), exhaust gas emissions are minimized and the temperature distribution at the combustion chamber outlet (8) is optimum. The inner boundary wall (6a) can comprise a deflection section (12) or the outer wall section (6b) can be inclined towards the pilot burner longitudinal axis (3a), such that the cross-section of the pilot burner zone (5) decreases in the direction of flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9627766 A1 19960912; CA 2216115 A1 19960912; EP 0813670 A1 19971229; EP 0813670 B1 20000628; US 6058710 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100304

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100304

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605505 20000803

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990426

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970731

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB