Global Patent Index - EP 0813935 B1

EP 0813935 B1 2002-09-04 - Paper cutting device

Title (en)

Paper cutting device

Title (de)

Papierschneider

Title (fr)

Dispositif de coupe pour papier

Publication

EP 0813935 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97110240 A

Priority

JP 16149996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0813935A1] Disclosed is a paper cutting device, having: a stationary cutter (1) which has such a length as to cut a paper to be cut and includes a base portion where the paper is laid down, the stationary cutter being made of cold-rolled steel; a guide rail (1b) which is disposed in the direction of crossing the paper; a frame (1(a)) for composing linkage between the stationary cutter and the guide rail; a cutter holder (2) which reciprocatively moves through the guide rail (1b) and is so formed as to stride the stationary cutter (1), the cutter holder (2) including a cutting wheel (3) on the side of setting the paper on the stationary cutter (1) and having an aperture in its forward direction to expose an edge of the cutting wheel (3), the cutting wheel (3) being rotatably journaled by the cutter holder (2) so that the edge of the cutting wheel (3) intersects to an edge of the stationary cutter (1) at a predetermined quantity; means for pressing the edge of the cutting wheel (3) against the edge of the stationary cutter (1); and carrying means for reciprocating the cutter holder (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/20; B26D 1/00; B41J 11/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/20 (2006.01); B26D 1/24 (2006.01); H04N 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0813935 A1 19971229; EP 0813935 B1 20020904; CN 1118368 C 20030820; CN 1172009 A 19980204; DE 69715101 D1 20021010; DE 69715101 T2 20030102; JP H106279 A 19980113

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090623

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090623

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715101 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000410

1998-09-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1998-09-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971014

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB