Global Patent Index - EP 0813943 B1

EP 0813943 B1 2002-11-27 - Cutting center

Title (en)

Cutting center

Title (de)

Schneidzentrum

Title (fr)

Centre de tranchage

Publication

EP 0813943 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97109938 A

Priority

CH 153296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0813943A2] The cutting centre for producing ingots comprises connected in the same assembly first device (23) for carrying out the necessary operations (24) for the production of packaged sections for later use. The operations are managed and connected together by a second device (25) so as to form sub groups (26). These sub groups are themselves connected by third means (27) comprising storage, handling and transport systems. A transfer chain is thus formed in which all the operations and means are compatible and interconnected. The second device for managing the necessary operations are constituted by a computer operated multi-axis robot which carries out all the operations of fixing the piece on a support ready to be mounted on the cutting system. The cutting unit comprises an abrasive saw or a saw with several diamond blades. The packaging unit comprises a packaging system for placing the cut sections into cassettes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 5/00; B28D 7/04; H01L 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 51/00 (2006.01); B23P 13/04 (2006.01); B25J 9/16 (2006.01); B28D 5/00 (2006.01); B28D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 5/0058 (2013.01); B28D 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0813943 A2 19971229; EP 0813943 A3 19980408; EP 0813943 B1 20021127; CH 691798 A5 20011031; DE 69717349 D1 20030109; DE 69717349 T2 20031009; JP H1076430 A 19980324; US 6524162 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717349

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120618

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120618

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-01-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: APPLIED MATERIALS SWITZERLAND SA

- Free text: HCT SHAPING SYSTEMS SA#ROUTE DE GENEVE 42#1033 CHESEAUX (CH) -TRANSFER TO- APPLIED MATERIALS SWITZERLAND SA#42 ROUTE DE GENEVE#1033 CHESEAUX-SUR-LAUSANNE (CH)

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717349 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020429

1998-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980715

1998-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HCT SHAPING SYSTEMS SA

1998-08-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAUSER, CHARLES

1998-04-22 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19971229

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

1998-04-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI