Global Patent Index - EP 0814051 B1

EP 0814051 B1 2001-12-05 - Method of operating a forklift and forklift operated by this method

Title (en)

Method of operating a forklift and forklift operated by this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Flurförderzeugs und Flurförderzeug zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode de fonctionnement d'un élévateur de fourche et élévateur pour la mise en oeuvre de cette méthode

Publication

EP 0814051 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109318 A

Priority

DE 19624308 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814051A1] The method has a control unit for the vehicle operating drive supplying a control signal for the maximum permissible velocity of the vehicle, which is altered depending on the vehicle travel direction. The vehicle has a braked wheel axle (2) and a non-braked wheel axle (3), with the control signal allowing a higher maximum vehicle velocity when the vehicle is travelling in the direction of the braked wheel axle than in the reverse direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 9/075; B66F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/24 (2006.01); B66F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 17/003 (2013.01); B66F 9/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814051 A1 19971229; EP 0814051 B1 20011205; DE 19624308 A1 19980102

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040609

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040609

2003-06-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705623 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000210

1998-09-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1998-09-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-03-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980121

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT