Global patent index - EP 0814133 B1

EP 0814133 B1 2000-02-02 - Process for dry continous granulation of carbon black

Title (en)

Process for dry continous granulation of carbon black

Title (de)

Verfahren zur kontinuierlichen Trockengranulation von Pulverruss

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la granulation sèche en continu de noir de carbone

Publication

EP 0814133 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97108571 A

Priority

DE 19623198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2207525A1] The invention relates to a process and apparatus for the continuous dry granulation of powdered carbon black. Granulation is performed with the assistance of a toothed-shaft granulator which has, in a circular, cylindrical, drum-shaped stator with a longitudinal axis, an axially-arranged toothed shaft which rotates about the longitudinal axis of the stator and conveys the powdered carbon black from the inlet to the exit of the granulator, with simultaneous granulation. The teeth have a diameter and a length, and are arranged on the shaft axially-offset with respect to each other along a helical line around the shaft. The maximum peripheral speed of the ends of the teeth is between 1 and 6 m/s, and the average residence time for the carbon black in the granulator is between 20 and 600 seconds. Perferrably, the axial distance between neighbouring teeth is less than their diameter so that complete covering is provided by the teeth along the axis, and the length of the teeth is selected so that the clear space between the ends of the teeth and the stator wall is 0.5 to 3 mm. It is advantageous to have the teeth arranged on the shaft along two or more helical lines. This means that, for comparably-sized equipment, the carbon black throughput can be increased several times as compared with pelletising drums used in a conventional manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09C 1/60; B01J 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 2/10 (2006.01); C01B 31/14 (2006.01); C09C 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09C 1/60 (2013.01); C01P 2004/51 (2013.01); C01P 2006/10 (2013.01); C01P 2006/11 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); C01P 2006/19 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19623198 A1 19971218; AU 2480097 A 19971218; AU 712127 B2 19991028; BR 9703525 A 19990105; CA 2207525 A1 19971211; CN 1152926 C 20040609; CN 1171418 A 19980128; CZ 291112 B6 20021211; CZ 9701726 A3 19971217; EG 21101 A 20001129; EP 0814133 A1 19971229; EP 0814133 B1 20000202; ES 2142121 T3 20000401; HR P970317 A2 19980228; HR P970317 B1 20011231; HU 220108 B 20011028; HU 9701029 A1 20000528; HU 9701029 D0 19970828; IN 191978 B 20040131; JP H1060301 A 19980303; MX 9704297 A 19980628; PL 185634 B1 20030630; PL 320498 A1 19971222; PT 814133 E 20000630; TR 9700488 A2 19971221; TR 9700488 A3 19971221; US 6231624 B1 20010515; ZA 9705142 B 19980105

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040529

2005-05-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050528

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-02-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20041129

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040529

2004-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-02-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-08-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Free Format Text: DEGUSSA AG DE

- Effective date: 20030623

2003-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DEGUSSA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2003-05-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030514

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030506

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142121

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701081

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

1999-09-08 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DEGUSSA-HUELS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1999-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA-HUELS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980908

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970528

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT