Global Patent Index - EP 0814168 B1

EP 0814168 B1 2000-10-18 - Process for tanning of leather

Title (en)

Process for tanning of leather

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Gerbung von Leder

Title (fr)

Procédé de tannage du cuir

Publication

EP 0814168 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109282 A

Priority

DE 19624821 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814168A1] A tanning process comprises (1) treatment with a compound containing carbamoyl sulphonate groups and (2) treatment at a pH greater than 4 with a mineral tanning agent chosen from chromium (III), iron (II) or (III), aluminium (III), titanium (IV) or zirconium (IV) compounds, without the use of a pickling agent. The compound used in step (1) is a reaction product of the following components : (A) an organic polyisocyanate ; (B) 0.01-0.4 equivalents per isocyanate group in (A) of a polyether alcohol containing polyalkylene oxide groups, of which 40-100 mol.% are polyethylene oxide units with a sequence length of 5-70 (the equivalents are based on the hydroxyl groups in the alcohol) ; (C) optional further components which can react with isocyanate groups ; and (D) ammonium or alkali bi- or di-sulphites.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14C 3/18; C14C 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14C 3/04 (2006.01); C14C 3/18 (2006.01); C14C 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 3/28 (2013.01); C14C 3/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814168 A1 19971229; EP 0814168 B1 20001018; DE 19624821 A1 19980102; ES 2152594 T3 20010201; JP H1060499 A 19980303; US 5820634 A 19981013

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020609

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-06-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020609

2002-02-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010630

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010606

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010605

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010515

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152594 T3

2000-12-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702486 20001123

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2000-10-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991019

1998-09-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT NL SE

1998-09-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980629

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE