Global Patent Index - EP 0814172 B1

EP 0814172 B1 2002-09-11 - Powder metallurgy hot-work tool steel, and process for its manufacture

Title (en)

Powder metallurgy hot-work tool steel, and process for its manufacture

Title (de)

PM-Warmarbeitsstahl und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Acier à outils pour travail à chaud, obtenu par métallurgie des poudres et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0814172 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109706 A

Priority

EP 96109706 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814172A1] A powder metallurgically produced hot work steel has the composition (by wt.) 0.25-0.45% C, 2.40-4.25% Cr, 2.50-4.40% Mo, 0.20-0.95% V, 2.10-3.90% Co, 0.10-0.80% Si, 0.15-0.65% Mn, balance Fe and impurities. Preferably, the steel has a purity K1 of less than 10 mu m. Also claimed is powder metallurgical production of the above hot work steel by (a) atomising a steel melt of the above composition in a high purity nitrogen atmosphere; (b) filling the resulting powder into capsules designed such that the final product achieves its intended shape with maximum material yield; (c) shaking the filled capsules to achieve maximum filling density; (d) evacuating and then gas-tightly sealing the capsules; and (e) hot isostatically pressing the capsules at 1000-1230 degrees C and 0.8-3.5 (preferably 1) kbar pressure for ≥ 3 hrs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 33/02; B22F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/14 (2006.01); B22F 3/15 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 33/0264 (2013.01); B22F 3/004 (2013.01); B22F 3/1258 (2013.01); B22F 9/082 (2013.01); B22F 2201/02 (2013.01); B22F 2201/20 (2013.01); B22F 2202/01 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/004 + B22F 2202/01 + B22F 2201/20
  2. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 9/082 + B22F 3/1258 + B22F 3/15
  3. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 9/082 + B22F 2201/02

Citation (examination)

ASM Specialty Handbook, Tool Materials, 1995, J.R. Davis, 144-146

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814172 A1 19971229; EP 0814172 B1 20020911; AT 223975 T 20020915; DE 59609657 D1 20021017; DK 0814172 T3 20021118; ES 2181827 T3 20030301; JP 3456707 B2 20031014; JP H10510884 A 19981020; KR 100270453 B1 20001201; PT 814172 E 20030131; US 6015446 A 20000118; WO 9748829 A1 19971224

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20050629

2005-06-29 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20041217

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040617

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-01-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HAU HANSPETER

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-12-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041217

2004-07-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-06-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040617

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BOEHLER EDELSTAHL GMBH

2003-07-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BOEHLER EDELSTAHL GMBH

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-07-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030701

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-26 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030624

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030612

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-03 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030603

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030602

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-26 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-25 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20030525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181827 T3

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404235

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021210

2002-11-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609657 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223975 T 20020915

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990827

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970227

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE