Global Patent Index - EP 0814185 B1

EP 0814185 B1 2001-03-21 - Method and device for pretreating a carpet yarn with fine surface hairs

Title (en)

Method and device for pretreating a carpet yarn with fine surface hairs

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vorbehandlung eines an seiner Oberfläche feine Härchen aufweisenden Teppichgarns

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de prétraitement d'un fil pour tapis avec poils fins de surface

Publication

EP 0814185 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109828 A

Priority

  • DE 19624910 A
  • US 87768997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814185A2] To treat the hairy surface of a carpet yarn, the outer surface of the yarn is subjected to a temp. which is greatly higher than the characteristic yarn temp., for a short time spell. Also claimed is an appts. with a singeing burner (100), with a singeing channel (10) through a housing (7) on a straight axis and open at both ends (10',10"). The yarn (5) is passed through the channel (10), parallel to its longitudinal axis, along a line (6) of travel. Jet burners (15,15') near the channel entry (10') face each other on both sides of the yarn (5), to deliver mixed gas streams (19) to the yarn (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02J 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02J 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02J 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814185 A2 19971229; EP 0814185 A3 19990616; EP 0814185 B1 20010321; DE 19624910 A1 19980108; US 5903962 A 19990518; US 6032340 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KUSTERS ZITTAUER MASCHINENFABRIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2004-08-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040813

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010626

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010618

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703165 20010426

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990712

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990528

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL