Global Patent Index - EP 0814195 B1

EP 0814195 B1 2002-11-27 - Three layers headbox

Title (en)

Three layers headbox

Title (de)

Dreischichtenstoffauflauf

Title (fr)

Caisse de tête à trois couches

Publication

EP 0814195 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97107984 A

Priority

DE 19624052 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19624052A1] The triple-level stock inlet, for a papermaking machine for the prodn. of multi-layered papers, has one separation blade (4) in a rigid structure, with the other separation blade (5) with a pivot (6). Also claimed is a method to deliver a triple-layered pulp suspension to a fourdrinier where the stock inlet produces three defined and different suspension flows (7-9). The three flows are brought together directly before arrival at the fourdrinier or on reaching the fourdrinier. The flow speeds are set so that the outer layer moves faster than the inner layer. pref. a fourdrinier moves round a roller to one side of the stock inlet, with the rigid blade (4) next to the roller, or the swing blade (5) is next to the roller. The swing blade (5) is set to give the outer flow suspension layer a higher speed than the inner layer. The flow speed of the centre suspension layer is faster than the inner layer suspension flow, and equals the speed of the suspension flow for the outer layer, or can be slower than the outer layer flow speed. The flow speed for the centre layer can equal the pulp flow speed for the inner layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/02; D21F 1/06; D21F 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01); D21F 11/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19624052 A1 19961212; AT 228595 T 20021215; CA 2207971 A1 19971217; CA 2207971 C 20060905; EP 0814195 A2 19971229; EP 0814195 A3 19980107; EP 0814195 B1 20021127; JP 4049846 B2 20080220; JP H1053990 A 19980224; US 6059929 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59708797

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120517

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228595 T

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110513

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708797 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228595 T 20021215

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1998-09-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980707

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE