Global Patent Index - EP 0814199 B1

EP 0814199 B1 2000-09-06 - Process for applying an asphalt mixture

Title (en)

Process for applying an asphalt mixture

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einbauen von Asphaltmischgut

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la pose d'un mélange asphaltique

Publication

EP 0814199 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109535 A

Priority

  • DE 19625006 A
  • US 87909097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814199A2] The road-making machine comprises two rammers (1,2) as compression units arranged in the direction of travel directly one behind the other, provided with a controlled feed incline (4), strip-shaped and working counterwise to one another. Connected to them is a smoothing board (3). The laying process is undertaken with a lift adjustment of the rammers, with which the lower dead point of the front rammer (1) in the direction of travel corresponds approximately to the upper dead point of the rear rammer (2) in the direction of travel. The lift range of the front rammer is somewhat larger than that of the rear rammer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/34 (2006.01); E01C 19/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/407 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814199 A2 19971229; EP 0814199 A3 19980513; EP 0814199 B1 20000906; CN 1122739 C 20031001; CN 1172188 A 19980204; DE 19625006 A1 19980115; DE 59702306 D1 20001012; ES 2151210 T3 20001216; JP 3632184 B2 20050323; JP H1060813 A 19980303; US 5947638 A 19990907

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-13 [REG GB 9110] PERIOD PRESCRIBED HAS BEEN EXTENDED UNDER RULE 110(6)/1990

- Free text: THE PATENT/APPLICATION IS REINSTATED SUBJECT TO SPECIAL TERMS FOR THIRD PARTY INTERESTS.

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-06-06 [REG GB 710B] REQUEST OF ALTER TIME LIMITS

- Free text: THE PATENT IS NOW REINSTATED WITH A GRANT DATE EFFECTIVE IN THE UK OF 06.09.00

2001-04-04 [REG GB 710B] REQUEST OF ALTER TIME LIMITS

- Free text: A REQUEST HAS BEEN FILED UNDER RULE 110(4) OF THE RULES 1995 TO EXTEND THE PERIOD FOR FILING A TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION. THIS PATENT WAS ANNOUNCED AS VOID IN THE PATENTS AND DESIGNS JOURNAL 5834 DATED 07.03.2001.

2001-03-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151210 T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702306 20001012

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990913

1999-01-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

1999-01-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1998-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980527

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB