Global Patent Index - EP 0814212 A3

EP 0814212 A3 2000-08-16 - Structural frame appliance

Title (en)

Structural frame appliance

Title (de)

Tragrahmenvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour cadre porteur

Publication

EP 0814212 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97109611 A

Priority

DE 19624633 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814212A2] The device (10.1,10.2,10.3) comprises a first carrying arrangement (12.1), with a strut unit having a shutter unit allowing staging. A standardised strut element (14) is constructed. There is a flexible connection or joint (16) for the strut and shutter elements which has been precast. The connection enables closure of the strut element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/24; E04B 1/342; E04H 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/24 (2006.01); E04G 5/12 (2006.01); E04G 7/30 (2006.01); E04G 7/32 (2006.01); E04H 15/34 (2006.01); E04H 15/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/64 (2013.01); E04B 1/24 (2013.01); E04G 5/12 (2013.01); E04G 7/307 (2013.01); E04G 7/32 (2013.01); E04H 15/34 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2415 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2424 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2433 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2451 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2463 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2472 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2487 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2496 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814212 A2 19971229; EP 0814212 A3 20000816; DE 19624633 A1 19980102

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021010

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/24 A, 7E 04B 1/342 B, 7E 04H 15/34 B

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILHELM LAYHER VERMOEGENSVERWALTUNGS-GMBH

1999-11-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANGER, RUTH, GEB. LAYHER

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

1997-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI