Global Patent Index - EP 0814227 B1

EP 0814227 B1 2002-09-25 - Metal door frame for use in dry construction

Title (en)

Metal door frame for use in dry construction

Title (de)

Metallische Zarge für den trockenen Innenausbau

Title (fr)

Dormant métallique pour murs en construction à sec

Publication

EP 0814227 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97890101 A

Priority

AT 106296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814227A2] The frame has at least one preferably C-shaped stirrup firmly connected with it on its vertical section, supporting door hinges. One stirrup (11) is provided in the area of at least one, preferably several door hinges (5). The door hinges with their threaded bolts (7) extend to the stirrup and are preferably screwed to the frame and also the stirrup. Preferably, the stirrup in the area of its ends is connected to the frame by welding. The screw-in end of the threaded bolt (7) is formed as a thread cutter, and cuts a thread in the hole of the stirrup when the hinge is screwed into position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/12; E05D 5/02; E06B 1/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/12 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E06B 1/00 (2006.01); E06B 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/023 (2013.01); E06B 1/003 (2013.01); E06B 1/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814227 A2 19971229; EP 0814227 A3 19980506; EP 0814227 B1 20020925; AT 224993 T 20021015; AT 404379 B 19981125; AT A106296 A 19980315; CZ 292726 B6 20031217; CZ 9701866 A3 19980114; DE 59708299 D1 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070616

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060616

2005-07-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050408

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708299 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

2002-09-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224993 T 20021015

1999-02-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981230

1999-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI NL

1999-01-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL

1999-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981106

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI NL