Global Patent Index - EP 0814235 B1

EP 0814235 B1 2000-03-01 - Radial turbine for a turbocharger

Title (en)

Radial turbine for a turbocharger

Title (de)

Radialturbine für einen Turbolader

Title (fr)

Turbine radiale pour une turbosoufflante

Publication

EP 0814235 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97106344 A

Priority

DE 19623558 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19623558C1] The radial turbine is fitted to a turbocharger on a internal combustion engine, and has adjustable guide equipment with at least two separate gas supply channels. The latter can be moved to two different positions, using a guide ring which is formed by one of two control rings (S1,S2) inside a guide cylinder (F) which encloses the turbine blades. The guide equipment consists of the guide ring with the two control rings, and gas supply channels of different cross sections are formed between them by a separating wall (17). The wall has an end area which is larger than the annular channel area of the guide cylinder in the turbine casing (7). The first control ring (S1) has an annular seal (16) between the channel (5b) and the casing, so that a pressure difference from the other annular channel (5a) is created.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/14 (2006.01); F01D 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/143 (2013.01); F01D 17/167 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19623558 C1 19970410; EP 0814235 A1 19971229; EP 0814235 B1 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150417

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701159

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701159

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140403

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-12-31 [PGRI FI] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080417

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081101

2007-03-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-06-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CATERPILLAR MOTOREN GMBH & CO. KG

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701159 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI NL

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990820

1998-01-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAK MOTOREN GMBH & CO. KG

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971020

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI NL