Global Patent Index - EP 0814268 B1

EP 0814268 B1 2001-03-07 - Modular construction for manufacturing of a pump, particularly a pump driven by a permanent magnet coupling

Title (en)

Modular construction for manufacturing of a pump, particularly a pump driven by a permanent magnet coupling

Title (de)

Modularer Bausatz zur Herstellung einer Pumpe, insbes. einer Permanentmagnetkupplungspumpe

Title (fr)

Ensemble modulaire pour la fabrication d'une pompe, en particulier d'une pompe entraînée par une accouplement magnétique

Publication

EP 0814268 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97110023 A

Priority

DE 29610798 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814268A1] The modular assembly (1) comprises a core element (2), a drive unit (3) with a driveshaft (4). At least one sub-assembly is situated between all the components of the assembly. Each sub-assembly can include one or more elements such as a cage which surrounds the core. The sub-assembly may be fitted with heating elements. A driver is fitted with an external magnet carrier (14), and serves to drive a rotor located inside the core. A coupling (18) has a coupling shaft (19) with a flange (20) located on one end to create a connection between the drive unit and the driver. A cage carrier (21) has a connection face (22) for the cage at one end, and a heat block (23) is located also on the cage carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/02; F04D 29/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 13/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29610798 U1 19970227; EP 0814268 A1 19971229; EP 0814268 B1 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070619

2009-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070619

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20080227

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [REG GB 729U] OFFER TO SURRENDER ACCEPTED BY THE COMPTROLLER (SECT. 29/1977)

2007-11-14 [REG GB 729S] OFFER TO SURRENDER (SECT. 29/1977)

2007-11-02 [REG FR RT] COMPLETE RENUNCIATION

2007-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-25 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070625

2007-06-25 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070625

2007-06-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070614

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-02 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050701

2002-01-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KSB AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-01-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (GERMANY) GMBH

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-05-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: CABINET ROLAND NITHARDT CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDU

2001-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703092 20010412

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991208

1998-09-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-09-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971129

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI