Global Patent Index - EP 0814308 B1

EP 0814308 B1 2002-11-20 - Radiator

Title (en)

Radiator

Title (de)

Heizkörper

Title (fr)

Radiateur

Publication

EP 0814308 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97108573 A

Priority

DE 29610869 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814308A2] The radiator is especially of the tubular type, and has similar base elements (G) arranged beside one another, and which are linked together by head and foot connections. It also has connections for the forward and return flows, and at least the element (G4) with a nozzle (A) for the forward flow connection, is arranged between other elements. This nozzle is connected to an end element (G1), which may contain a thermostatic valve, by an immersion pipe (2). The pipe is straight, and has a leak-proof insertion connection into a lateral opening in the nozzle, which is mounted in the foot region of the element. The nozzle may have a seal (4) between its inside and the end of the pipe, and this may be made of a durable elastic material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12; F28D 1/053

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/12 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0073 (2013.01); F24D 19/0002 (2013.01); F24D 19/0036 (2013.01); F24D 19/0078 (2013.01); F28D 1/05308 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29610869 U1 19960829; AT 228229 T 20021215; EP 0814308 A2 19971229; EP 0814308 A3 19981216; EP 0814308 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708748

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110528

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110528

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110528

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228229 T

- Effective date: 20110528

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-12-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ZEHNDER VERKAUFS- UND VERWALTUNGS A.G.

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100517

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100514

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100611

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100518

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZEHNDER VERKAUFS- UND VERWALTUNGS AG

- Free text: ZEHNDER VERKAUFS- UND VERWALTUNGS AG#MOORTALSTRASSE 1#5722 GRAENICHEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ZEHNDER VERKAUFS- UND VERWALTUNGS AG#MOORTALSTRASSE 1#5722 GRAENICHEN (CH)

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708748 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228229 T 20021215

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010921

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990607

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL