Global Patent Index - EP 0814389 B1

EP 0814389 B1 2000-09-27 - Clockwork-movement with a guide tube between a plate and a bridge

Title (en)

Clockwork-movement with a guide tube between a plate and a bridge

Title (de)

Uhrwerk mit einem Führungsrohr zwischen einer Werkplatte und einer Brücke

Title (fr)

Mouvement d'horlogerie comportant un tube de guidage entre une platine et un pont

Publication

EP 0814389 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97109262 A

Priority

FR 9607555 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814389A1] The chronometer-watch mechanism includes a lower plate (1) a bridge (2) and a upper plate (3). The bridge supports the rotor of a stepping motor with a wheel (7) cooperating with a second wheel (9) mounted on a spindle (10). The spindle is inserted through a guiding tube (15) fixed between the bridge and the lower plate. The spindle extremity (18) crosses a dial (19) and actuates a watch hand (18a) which can indicate minutes or hours.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04F 7/08; G04B 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/14 (2006.01); G04B 29/04 (2006.01); G04F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 29/04 (2013.01); G04F 7/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814389 A1 19971229; EP 0814389 B1 20000927; CN 1122890 C 20031001; CN 1170893 A 19980121; DE 69703184 D1 20001102; DE 69703184 T2 20010517; FR 2749949 A1 19971219; FR 2749949 B1 19980807; HK 1006100 A1 20040618; JP 4099246 B2 20080611; JP H1082867 A 19980331; US 5889738 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060607

2006-06-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060607

2005-05-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050527

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703184

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-02

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2000-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991130

1998-09-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES GB IT LI

1998-09-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980629

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI