Global Patent Index - EP 0814396 B1

EP 0814396 B1 2000-09-27 - Circuit for generating a voltage reference

Title (en)

Circuit for generating a voltage reference

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Erzeugung eines Referenzpotentials

Title (fr)

Circuit pour générer une tension de référence

Publication

EP 0814396 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109351 A

Priority

DE 19624676 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19624676C1] The circuit arrangement comprises a first transistor (T1), whose emitter is joined with a ground voltage (M) and whose basis and collector are connected with each other, and a second transistor (T2), whose basis is joined with the basis of the first transistor. A first resistance (R1) is connected between the collector of the first transistor and an output (U) for providing the reference voltage. A second resistance (R2), is connected between the collector of the second transistor and the output. A third resistance (R3) is connected between the emitter of the second transistor and the ground voltage. A third transistor (T3) is provided, whose basis is connected with the collector of the second transistor and whose emitter is joined with the ground voltage. A fourth transistor (T4) has its collector connected with supply voltage (V), its emitter connected to the output and its basis to the collector of the third transistor, whereby a first current source (R5, T5) is provided between basis and collector of the fourth transistor. A second current source (T17, R16) is connected in parallel to the first current source, for compensation of the current sway of the first current source.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 3/26; G05F 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/22 (2006.01); G05F 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/265 (2013.01); G05F 3/222 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19624676 C1 19971002; EP 0814396 A2 19971229; EP 0814396 A3 19981209; EP 0814396 B1 20000927; US 5969566 A 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140609

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140609

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140609

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702395

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130605

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130605

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, 81669 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY GMBH, 85579 NEUBIBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Effective date: 20130326

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, 85579 NEUBIBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, 85579 NEUBIBERG, DE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Representative's name: ZEDLITZ, PETER, DIPL.-INF.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20130326

2013-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Representative's name: ZEDLITZ, PETER, DIPL.-INF.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20130315

2013-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Representative's name: ZEDLITZ, PETER, DIPL.-INF.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Representative's name: ZEDLITZ, PETER, DIPL.-INF.UNIV., DE

2013-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Representative's name: ZEDLITZ, PETER, DIPL.-INF.UNIV., DE

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702395

- Representative's name: ZEDLITZ, PETER, DIPL.-INF.UNIV., DE

2013-01-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121213 AND 20121219

2012-12-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INTEL MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20121112

2012-08-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG, DE

- Effective date: 20120730

2012-07-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120614 AND 20120620

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-11-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702395 20001102

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991021

1999-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990105

1998-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT