Global Patent Index - EP 0814417 B1

EP 0814417 B1 2002-09-18 - Method of and system for unifying data structures

Title (en)

Method of and system for unifying data structures

Title (de)

Verfahren und System um Datenstrukturen zu vereinigen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour unifier des structures de données

Publication

EP 0814417 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97304334 A

Priority

US 67251596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814417A1] A method of and system for unifying data structures (72, 82) creates opaque clauses that can be handled independent of the combination of contexts they represent. In conjoining a first clause and a second clause as part of a unification of a first graph, if the conjoined clause is not already copied to the first graph, then a third clause is created that is opaque and has a pointer to the conjoined clause. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30; G06F 9/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 17/27 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 8/3135 (2013.01); G06F 17/27 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814417 A1 19971229; EP 0814417 B1 20020918; DE 69715525 D1 20021024; DE 69715525 T2 20030116; JP H10105551 A 19980424; US 5903860 A 19990511

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170618

2017-07-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170618

2017-06-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715525

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715525 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020123

1998-09-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1998-09-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980629

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB