Global Patent Index - EP 0814436 A3

EP 0814436 A3 2000-07-19 - Tachograph with drive for time-dependently driving diagram discs serving as record carriers

Title (en)

Tachograph with drive for time-dependently driving diagram discs serving as record carriers

Title (de)

Fahrtschreiber mit einem Laufwerk für den zeitabhängigen Antrieb von als Aufzeichnungsträger dienenden Diagrammscheiben

Title (fr)

Tachygraphe avec dispositif d'entraînement pour actionner en fonction du temps les disques à diagramme servant comme support d'enregistrement

Publication

EP 0814436 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97109070 A

Priority

DE 29610675 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814436A2] The tachograph disc is mounted on a turntable that has a centre drive spindle Ä22Ü and this is coupled via a transmission to a drive motor Ä31Ü. The assembly is produced as a module that slides on guides into a housing. The transmission is made via a multi-pinion gear train Ä33-45Ü. A further train of gears Ä46-50Ü is supported on one end of a two-part lever Ä52Ü and at the other end the gears are selectively coupled to the main transmission. The lever moves ÄXÜ between stops Ä55, 56Ü to control operation of the tachograph which works to real time. A disc at one end Ä14Ü displays the operating time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/00 (2006.01); G07C 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29610675 U1 19960829; EP 0814436 A2 19971229; EP 0814436 A3 20000719; JP 2994308 B2 19991227; JP H1063904 A 19980306

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040102

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT