Global Patent Index - EP 0814490 B1

EP 0814490 B1 2001-01-17 - Safety device for position switch

Title (en)

Safety device for position switch

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Positionsschalter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour commutateur de positionnement

Publication

EP 0814490 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97109371 A

Priority

DE 19624172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0814490A2] The device has an actuation element (8) and a release element (4) which are mechanically encoded so that so that a mechanical decoding results from their mutual engagement, resulting in a mechanical force-locking between them. The release element also has an electronic read-write device (12) and the actuation element has a transponder (10). The actuation element is first programmed during its first engagement with the release element so that electronic decoding occurs for each subsequent engagement. An electrical switching process follows mechanical and electronic decoding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 27/06 (2006.01); H01H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 27/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0814490 A2 19971229; EP 0814490 A3 19991201; EP 0814490 B1 20010117; AT 198809 T 20010215; DE 19624172 A1 19980102; DE 19624172 C2 20000511; JP H1092270 A 19980410

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-04-16 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EUCHNER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010630

2001-06-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010610

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702918

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-22

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 198809

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BONN, ALFRED

2000-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TRAPP, ULRICH

2000-10-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VOLBERG, JUERGEN

2000-08-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991116

1999-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOELLER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI